Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sebastiano Roberto Asta

Apostolic Administrator of Ragusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1961 Born
31 May 198624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ragusa, Italy
28 Dec 202059.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ragusa, Italy
16 Jul 202160.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ragusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Roberto Asta
Father Sebastiano Roberto Asta (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Ragusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComiso, Diocese of Ragusa

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ragusa.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 28 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast