Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich Arndes

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442¹Born
27 Feb 149250.1AppointedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
1 Apr 149250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lübeck, Germany
16 Aug 150664.6DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich Arndes (VIAF: 81710633)
Bishop Dietrich Arndes (born 1442, died ) Bishop of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamburg, Archdiocese of Bremen (and Hamberg)
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1492, Number 2
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,036

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast