Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso de Argüello, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1403AppointedBishop of León, Spain
19 Aug 1415AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
7 Jun 1417AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
7 Jun 1419AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
Feb 1429³DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Argüello
Archbishop Alfonso de Argüello O.P. (died Feb 1429) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 300, and Page 386
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 444, and Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast