Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romolo Archinto

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1533Born
26 Apr 157441.2AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
6 Jun 157441.3Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
4 Sep 157643.6DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Romolo Archinto (VIAF: 257145387)
Bishop Romolo Archinto (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceNovara, Diocese of Novara
Buried Place (Original)Old, Cathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,018
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 12
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,404
  • ob/c2+: AT, 19 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Feb 2021

Quantcast