Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean d’Arces

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1370¹Born
28 Feb 143868.1AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
6 Apr 144474.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 144979.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 144979.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
12 Dec 145484.9DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Arces
Archbishop Jean d’Arces (born 1370, died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontiers
Death PlaceMoûtiers
Buried Place (Original)Moûtiers

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 245
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast