Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvio Cardinal Antoniano

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1540Born
17 Jun 156827.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 159958.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159958.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
16 Aug 160362.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

MicroData Summary for Silvio Antoniano (VIAF: 22253643)
Silvio Cardinal Antoniano (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast