Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo d’Antiochia, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sora, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1387AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
1 Oct 1399AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
27 Feb 1404AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
1405ResignedBishop of Assisi, Italy
29 Oct 1406AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
1420²DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo d’Antiochia
Bishop Giacomo d’Antiochia O.F.M. (died 1420) Bishop of Sora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 458, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast