Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heinrich Anhalt

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1306AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
23 Jan 1306Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
10 Nov 1307DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Anhalt
Archbishop Heinrich Anhalt (died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast