Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermanno degli Anastasi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Apr 1307AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
4 Dec 1307AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
24 Dec 1307Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
15 Aug 1321DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ermanno degli Anastasi
Bishop Ermanno degli Anastasi (died ) Bishop of Pistoia

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 400, and Page 256
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,694

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast