Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual Rebenga de Ampudia, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442¹Born
27 Jan 149654.0AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
5 Feb 149755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Burgos, Spain
19 Jul 151270.5DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pascual Rebenga de Ampudia
Bishop Pascual Rebenga de Ampudia O.P. (born 1442, died ) Bishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmpudia, Diocese of Palencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgos, Diocese of Burgos
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 142
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,997
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 311, Number 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast