Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidoro Aliaga, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1565Born
14 Jul 158520.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Oct 160843.5AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
13 Jun 161146.1AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Mar 161246.9AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
30 May 161247.1InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
2 Jan 164882.7DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Aliaga
Archbishop Isidoro Aliaga O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 357
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 174
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 124, Number 793
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast