Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan Albacete Sáiz, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1889Born
1939¹49.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Nov 196172.1AppointedPrefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru
4 Dec 196273.1DiedPrefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Albacete Sáiz
Father Juan Albacete Sáiz S.J. (born , died ) Prefect of San Francisco Javier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca, Diocese of Cuenca, Spain

  • a priest for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast