Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Matteo (Jacques Mattieu) Ahmndah˝o (Akmardakno)

Deceased

Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey

Note/Previous Titular See: (Nisibi of the Syrians)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1833Born
3 Oct 185824.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 187945.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisibis
21 Sep 187945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisibis
10 Oct 188854.9AppointedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey
31 Aug 190874.8DiedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Matteo (Jacques Mattieu) Ahmndah˝o (Akmardakno)
Bishop Giacomo Matteo (Jacques Mattieu) Ahmndah˝o (Akmardakno) (born , died ) Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin
Death PlaceMardin

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1879, Number 50
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast