Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo Aguilar Hinojosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1341AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
18 Jul 1342AppointedBishop of SigŁenza, Spain
14 Aug 1348AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Jan 1351AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
1353²DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Aguilar Hinojosa
Archbishop Gonzalo Aguilar Hinojosa (died 1353) Archbishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 200, and Page 444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast