Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urso Afflitti

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1395AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
14 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
12 Aug 1405DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Urso Afflitti
Bishop Urso Afflitti (died ) Bishop of Monopoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 347, and Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast