Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aernald

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1160AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
20 Nov 1160Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Sep 1162DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Aernald
Bishop Aernald (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Andrews, Diocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 236
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast