Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bandino Accarigi

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1616Born
3 Mar 165639.8AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
12 Mar 165639.8Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
Aug 1670³54.2DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bandino Accarigi
Bishop Bandino Accarigi (born , died Aug 1670) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Diocese of Parma
Ordained BishopSanta Caterina da Siena in via Giulia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: AT, 27 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast