Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dafydd (David) ab Owain (Owen), O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1503AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
4 Feb 1504Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
11 Feb 1513DiedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Dafydd (David) ab Owain (Owen)
Bishop Dafydd (David) ab Owain (Owen) O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 120
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 73
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,472

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast