Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vladivostok

Dioecesis Vladivostokensis

Territory Lost

To: Apostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea}



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Siberia
1 December 1921ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Siberia (erected)
Diocese of Vladivostok
2 February 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Siberia Diocese of Vladivostok
13 April 1991Territory LostDiocese of Vladivostok Apostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea} (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 19 Sep 2012