Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cyprian Witte, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1890Born
22 Nov 191424.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
18 Jul 191524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
30 Jan 193241.4AppointedSuperior of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
10 Mar 194453.5AppointedPrefect of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]
15 Apr 194554.6DiedPrefect of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Witte
Father Cyprian Witte SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Germany

  • a priest for 29.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast