Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Chocó

Apostolica Praefectura Choco

Territory Lost

To: Diocese of Pereira



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 April 1908ErectedDiocese of Antioquía Prefecture Apostolic of Chocó (erected)
14 November 1952Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Chocó Vicariate Apostolic of Istmina (erected)
14 November 1952Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía
Prefecture Apostolic of Chocó
Vicariate Apostolic of Quibdó (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Chocó
Diocese of Manizales
Diocese of Armenia (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Chocó
Diocese of Manizales
Diocese of Pereira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950100,000100,20099.8%116175,88221566ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011