Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Herman Zahorskyi (Zahorski)

Deceased

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1595AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
22 Sep 1595AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
19 Oct 1596ConvertedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1600²DiedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Herman Zahorskyi (Zahorski):
Archbishop Herman Zahorskyi (Zahorski) (died 1600) Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 281
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,403

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015