Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Veit von Würtzburg

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1519Born
22 Apr 156141.8SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Nov 156142.4ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
13 Apr 156646.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
28 Apr 156646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
8 Jul 157758.0DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Veit von Würtzburg (VIAF: 267361500)
Bishop Veit von Würtzburg (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRothenkirchen
Ordained BishopSaint Thomas, Chapel, Bamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 11.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,343
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Oct 2017