Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Westfal

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443BornLübeck
30 Aug 150663.7SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
27 Nov 150663.9ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
22 Aug 150764.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lübeck, Germany
31 Dec 150967.0DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Westfal:
Bishop Wilhelm Westfal (died ) Bishop of Lübeck

  • a bishop for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013