Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerhard Maria Wagner

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1954 Born
10 Oct 197824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
31 Jan 200954.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Linz, Austria
31 Jan 200954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zuri
2 Mar 200954.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Linz, Austria
2 Mar 200954.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Zuri

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Maria Wagner (VIAF: 8442457)
Father Gerhard Maria Wagner (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWartberg ob der Aist

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Linz.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2009
  • ob: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018