Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innokentiy Ivan Vynnytskyi (Winnicki), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1654Born
19 Oct 167925.6SelectedBishop
6 Dec 167925.7ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
21 Dec 167925.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
22 Dec 167925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Dec 168026.7Ordained BishopBishop
23 Jun 169137.3ConvertedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
24 Feb 170046.0DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Innokentiy Ivan Vynnytskyi (Winnicki)
Bishop Innokentiy Ivan Vynnytskyi (Winnicki) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrizh

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,307
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 29
  • bp/bd/prof/od/op: CB, 11 Oct 2015
  • bp/bd/prof/od/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast