Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yosyf Ivan Szumlański (Shumlyanskyi)

Deceased

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643²Born
1 Feb 166825.0Ordained BishopBishop
9 Jun 170057.4ConvertedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Jul 170865.5DiedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Yosyf Ivan Szumlański (Shumlyanskyi)
Bishop Yosyf Ivan Szumlański (Shumlyanskyi) (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 40.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 269
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,306
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast