Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Stubai

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Sep 1437AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Oct 1437Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 Dec 1443DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Georg von Stubai:
Bishop Georg von Stubai (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013