Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ortensio Visconti

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1651Born
27 May 168129.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 170250.9AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
25 Jun 170251.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
13 Jun 172573.9DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ortensio Visconti
Bishop Ortensio Visconti (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,702, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast