Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Angelo Vincentini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerace


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1650AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
8 May 1650Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
20 Dec 1670³ResignedBishop of Gerace, Italy
24 Dec 1674DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Angelo Vincentini:
Bishop Michele Angelo Vincentini (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 113, Number 687
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013