Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbano Vigerio della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1550AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
19 Sep 1555AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
1560²SucceededBishop of Senigallia, Italy
1570²DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Urbano Vigerio della Rovere
Bishop Urbano Vigerio della Rovere (died 1570) Bishop of Senigallia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 240
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 20*
  • b: CB, 10 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast