Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Cardinal Vigerio della Rovere, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1446²Born
6 Oct 147630.7AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
1 Dec 150559.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150559.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1506²60.0AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
29 Oct 151165.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
9 May 151367.3ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
18 Jul 151670.5DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Vigerio della Rovere (VIAF: 61901912)
Marco Cardinal Vigerio della Rovere O.F.M. Conv. (born 1446, died ) Archbishop of Trani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Trastevere, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 235
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 28 Dec 2018

Quantcast