Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Verde

Deceased

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1865BornSant'Antimo
31 Mar 188823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
26 Jun 191550.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
14 Dec 192560.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 192560.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
16 Dec 193570.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
11 Oct 193974.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
29 Mar 195893.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Verde (VIAF: 89730955)
Alessandro Cardinal Verde (born , died ) Archpriest of Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a cardinal for 32.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1925

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Sep 2016