Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Vendeville

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1527Born
15 Jan 158860.5AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
29 May 158860.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
15 Oct 159265.3DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Vendeville (VIAF: 91196082)
Bishop Jean Vendeville (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainghin in Melantois, France
Ordained BishopS. Martin, Abbey, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast