Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolf von der Mark

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1334¹Born
6 Nov 135723.8AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
21 Jun 136329.4AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Apr 136430.2ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Sep 139460.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolf von der Mark: VIAF:81176946
Archbishop Adolf von der Mark (born 1334, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 346, and Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 25 Jan 2016