Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrique Alejandro Vallejo Bernal, C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Tierradentro, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1902Born
22 May 193230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Oct 195048.4AppointedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia
May 1977³74.9ResignedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia
22 Nov 198482.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Tierradentro, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Alejandro Vallejo Bernal
Father Enrique Alejandro Vallejo Bernal C.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Tierradentro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Cabal, Diocese of Manizales
Death PlaceCali, Archdiocese of Cali

  • a priest for 52.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast