Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Trevor

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1390SelectedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
21 Oct 1394ConfirmedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
1395²Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
1402²ResignedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
10 Apr 1410DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Trevor:
Bishop John Trevor (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 112
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013