Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Tolomei

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1662³Born
21 Jan 171552.7AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
27 Jan 171552.7Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
May 1718³56.0DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Tolomei
Bishop Niccolò Tolomei (born , died May 1718) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Angelo in Colle

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast