Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neytard von Thüngen

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1545Born
14 Dec 159146.6SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
21 Jun 159348.1ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
159650.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 159752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Dec 159853.6DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Neytard von Thüngen (VIAF: 45101564)
Bishop Neytard von Thüngen (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWüstensachsen
Ordained BishopBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 2.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,829
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast