Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pons de Thiard de Bissy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1521¹Born
17 Mar 157857.2AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
24 Jan 159473.0ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
23 Sep 160584.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pons de Thiard de Bissy
Bishop Pons de Thiard de Bissy (born 1521, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBissy
Death PlaceBragny, Saone et Loire

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,578, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast