Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kyrylo (Cyryl) Terletskyi (Terlecki)

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²Born
Jul 1576³31.5AppointedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
9 May 158540.3AppointedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Aug 1589³44.5AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 Aug 158944.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1595²50.0ResignedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Oct 159651.7ConvertedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
May 1607³62.3DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kyrylo (Cyryl) Terletskyi (Terlecki)
Bishop Kyrylo (Cyryl) Terletskyi (Terlecki) (born 1545, died May 1607) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerlo

  • a bishop for 17.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 261
  • b: CB, 23 Jun 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast