Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnoldo di Sassoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jan 1014AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
Feb 1014³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
17 Nov 1019DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnoldo di Sassoni
Archbishop Arnoldo di Sassoni (died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: ATh, 13 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast