Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nicolaus Szarvas, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Taming [Daming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1890Born
5 Aug 190615.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
25 Jul 192029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
31 Jan 193645.2AppointedPrefect of Taming [Daming], China
8 Jul 194756.6ResignedPrefect of Taming [Daming], China
20 Aug 196574.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Taming [Daming], China

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Szarvas
Father Nicolaus Szarvas S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Taming [Daming]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzcutbenedek, Hungary

  • a priest for 45.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast