Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Schenk von Limpurg

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470Born
13 Feb 150535.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
18 Apr 150535.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Sep 150535.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
31 May 152252.4DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Schenk von Limpurg (VIAF: 15568815)
Bishop Georg Schenk von Limpurg (born 1470, died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObersontheim
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast