Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Stella

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1660BornModugno
15 May 169231.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 May 169231.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 171352.9AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
3 Sep 171352.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
Dec 1725³65.1DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Stella:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Stella (born , died Dec 1725) Archbishop of Taranto

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015