Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuele Staravero

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Dramas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1819Born
21 Nov 184021.1Ordained BishopArchbishop
21 Nov 186142.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dramas
21 Nov 186142.1Converted
11 Sep 187252.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Dramas

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele Staravero
Archbishop Emmanuele Staravero (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Dramas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeros

  • a bishop for 31.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast