Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrich von Stammer

Deceased

Bishop of Naumburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1466AppointedBishop of Naumburg, Germany
31 Oct 1466³Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 1466Ordained BishopBishop of Naumburg, Germany
24 Mar 1480DiedBishop of Naumburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henrich von Stammer
Bishop Henrich von Stammer (died ) Bishop of Naumburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopJakobskapelle, Zeitz

  • a priest for 13.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 206
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,811
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,466, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast