Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich von Schönberg

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1402Born
30 May 146361.4SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
18 Aug 146361.6ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
12 Apr 147674.2DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Schönberg (VIAF: 238189573)
Bishop Dietrich von Schönberg (born 1402, died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast