Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph von Stadion

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1478Born
151536.8Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
Mar 151739.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
20 Apr 151739.1ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
5 Jul 151739.3Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
15 Apr 154365.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph von Stadion (VIAF: 72202625)
Bishop Christoph von Stadion (born Mar 1478, died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchelklingen
Ordained BishopDillingen

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast