Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moritz von Hutten

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1503Born
7 May 154036.4AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
17 Sep 154238.8Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
8 Dec 155249.0DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Moritz von Hutten (VIAF: 62350141)
Bishop Moritz von Hutten (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnstein
Ordained BishopEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast